+ − Full Text
+ − Action
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Joint Rule 11
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
March 15, 2016: Roll 309
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 8
March 15, 2016: Roll 419
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 8
March 8, 2016: Roll 301
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
March 8, 2016: Roll 244
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
March 1, 2016: Roll 204
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 62
- Present/NV: 14
March 1, 2016: Roll 205
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 30
- Present/NV: 11
March 1, 2016: Roll 206
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 8
February 16, 2016: Roll 90
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
February 16, 2016: Roll 91
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor