+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2021-334)
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 4:16 p.m. on April 27, 2021.
- Assigned Act No. 2021-334.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Reported from Rules
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Jones (M) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Taken up
- Jones (M) motion to remove from table adopted Voice Vote
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Jones (M) motion to Table adopted Roll Call 647
- Reported from Rules and tabled
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules
+ − Vote
April 6, 2021: Roll 647
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 37
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor