+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Reported from Rules
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Reported from Rules
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2016: Roll 313
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 3
March 17, 2016: Roll 314
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor