+ − Actions (19)
On June 29, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2021-225)
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 2:45 p.m. on April 7, 2021.
- Assigned Act No. 2021-225.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 796
- Third Reading Passed
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Children, Youth and Human Services
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Mooney intended to vote "Yea"
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 333
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 332
- Lee Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Children and Senior Advocacy
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor