+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 2:05 p.m. on April 30, 2015.
- Assigned Act No. 2015-112.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Reported from Rules
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Reported from Rules
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor