+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-83)
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 3:21 p.m. on April 23, 2019.
- Assigned Act No. 2019-83.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Reported from Rules
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Jones (M) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Reported from Rules
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor