+ − Actions (12)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 794
- Third Reading Passed
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 258
- Third Reading Passed
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Shelby County Legislation
+ − Votes (5)
April 6, 2017: Roll 436
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 13
April 6, 2017: Roll 437
- Yeas: 89
- Present/NV: 15
April 6, 2017: Roll 438
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 14
March 18, 2014: Roll 794
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 11
February 13, 2014: Roll 258
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 66
- Present/NV: 21