+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by House of Origin
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Jones motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Reported from Rules
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 78
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 77
- Clouse Amendment Offered
- Clouse motion to Table adopted Roll Call 76
- Clouse motion to Table adopted Roll Call 75
- Constitution, Campaigns and Elections Amendment to CCE Amdt Offered
On August 29, 0018 in the House:
- Read Second Time in Second House
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor