+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Action
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules
+ − Votes (4)
May 9, 2017: Roll 941
- Yeas: 20
- Present/NV: 15
April 20, 2017: Roll 554
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 89
April 18, 2017: Roll 543
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 2
February 23, 2017: Roll 118
- Yeas: 19
- Present/NV: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor