+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 14, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2021-21)
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-21.
- Delivered to Governor at 2:23 p.m. on February 23, 2021.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Reported from Rules
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Jones (M) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Reported from Rules
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor