+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- JS
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Reported from Rules
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Reported from Rules
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor