+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2021-362)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2021-362.
- Forwarded to Governor on April 29, 2021 at 11:53 p.m. on April 29, 2021.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules
- Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Rules
- Jones (M) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 11:52 a.m. on April 22, 2021.
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor