+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-175)
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2018-175.
- Delivered to Governor at 10:43 a.m. on March 1, 2018.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Reported from Rules
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Jones motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Reported from Rules as Favorable
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor