+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 29, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2021-301)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Forwarded to Governor on April 29, 2021 at 1:00 p.m.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 11:52 a.m. on April 22, 2021.
- Assigned Act No. 2021-301.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Reported from Rules
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Cosponsors Added
- Jones (M) motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Reported from Rules
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor