+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-14)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 34:28 p.m. on April 3, 2019.
- Enrolled
- Assigned Act No. 2019-14 on 04/08/2019.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Reported from Rules
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Sanderford motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor