+ − Actions (14)
On August 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On May 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transportation and Energy first Substitute Offered
On May 4, 2020 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 409
- Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 408
- Ward first Substitute Offered
- Ward motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
- Transportation and Energy zeroeth Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ward motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy