+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2018-105)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Delivered to Governor at 4:52 p.m. on February 13, 2018.
- Assigned Act No. 2018-105 on 02/20/2018.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules
- Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Rules as Favorable
- Jones motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor