+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Forwarded to Governor at 3:11 p.m. on April 23, 2013.
- Assigned Act No. 2013-126.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Reported from Rules
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed
- McCutcheon motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Rules Substitute Offered
- Reported from Rules with 1 substitute and
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules