+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 536
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry
+ − Vote
March 5, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 536
- Yeas: 93
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor