+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
- Signature Requested
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Dial first Substitute Offered
- Dial motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 940
- Williams Amendment Offered
- Williams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 941
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 942
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Concurrence Requested
- Standridge motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 835
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Public Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 400
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 401
- Hurst intended to vote "Yea"
- Cosponsors Added
- Engrossed
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
May 3, 2016: Roll 942
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
May 3, 2016: Roll 835
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 8
May 3, 2016: Roll 940
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 8
May 3, 2016: Roll 941
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
March 23, 2016: Roll 399
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 4
March 23, 2016: Roll 400
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 6
March 23, 2016: Roll 401
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 8
March 23, 2016: Roll 402
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 54
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor