+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
- Signature Requested
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Concurrence Requested
- Butler motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 622
- Enrolled
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Williams Amendment Offered
- Williams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 665
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 666
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 333
- Members intended to cosponsor
- Carns and Pringle intended to vote "Yea"
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
+ − Votes (5)
April 25, 2017: Roll 622
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 23
April 20, 2017: Roll 665
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 4
April 20, 2017: Roll 666
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 7
March 16, 2017: Roll 333
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 38
March 16, 2017: Roll 334
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 77
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor