+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 663
- Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 662
- Third Reading Passed
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Pringle intended to vote "Yea"
- Members intended to cosponsor
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 330
- Third Reading Passed
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
+ − Votes (4)
April 20, 2017: Roll 662
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 4
April 20, 2017: Roll 663
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 5
March 16, 2017: Roll 330
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 30
March 16, 2017: Roll 331
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 53
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor