+ − Effective Date
- April 13, 2022
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
- Forwarded to Governor on April 5, 2022 at 5:14 p.m. on April 5, 2022.
- Assigned Act No. 2022-343.
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 931
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Robbins intended to vote "Yea"
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 154
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Vote
April 5, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 931 Vote
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor