+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 9:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
- Assigned Act No. 2013-330.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1079
- Third Reading Passed
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Marsh Tabled Marsh Motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 299
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 209
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 208
- Public Safety and Homeland Security first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
May 20, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1079
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
April 18, 2013: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Yeas: 6
April 4, 2013: Marsh Tabled Marsh Motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 299
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 9
March 14, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 208
- Yeas: 97
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor