+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 12:20 p.m. on May 7, 2013.
- Assigned Act No. 2013-208.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 787
- Third Reading Passed
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Business and Labor
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 155
- Third Reading Passed
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business
+ − Vote
May 2, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 787
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor