+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1297
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Education Policy first Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 83
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 84
- Engrossed
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
+ − Votes (4)
May 19, 2017: Roll 1297
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 12
April 6, 2017: Roll 415
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 10
February 23, 2017: Roll 83
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 9
February 23, 2017: Roll 84
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor