+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary
- Holtzclaw motion to table Ross motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 841
- Ross motion to recommit
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 694
- Smitherman motion to rerefer
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 769
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 768
- Judiciary first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
May 7, 2013: Holtzclaw motion to table Ross motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 841
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 9
May 7, 2013: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
May 2, 2013: Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 694
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 8
April 24, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 768
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 1
April 24, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 769
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor