+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-415)
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second House
- Forwarded to Governor on March 22, 2018 at 2:22 p.m. on March 22, 2018.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1058
- Third Reading Passed
- Signature Requested
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2018-415.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Orr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 217
- Third Reading Passed
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2018: Roll 1058
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 7
February 6, 2018: Roll 217
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor