+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2022-94.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Delivered to Governor at 3:00 p.m. on March 1, 2022.
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 407
- Third Reading Passed
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Grimsley intended to vote "Yea"
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 41
- Third Reading Passed
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Vote
February 8, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 41 Vote
- Yeas: 22
- Present/NV: 15
- Absent: 66