+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2013-267.
- Forwarded to Secretary of State on May 20, 2013 at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1198
- Third Reading Passed
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bussman motion to table Ross motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 839
- Ross motion to recommit
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Orr motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 681
- Smitherman motion to rerefer
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1019
- Henry motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 1018
- Engrossed
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Jones motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Jones motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Jones motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Jones motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 18
- Public Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Carried Over
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
May 20, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1198
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 4
May 7, 2013: Bussman motion to table Ross motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 839
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 7
May 7, 2013: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Yeas: 8
May 2, 2013: Orr motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 681
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 7
April 30, 2013: Henry motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 1018
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 34
February 12, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 18
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor