+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-560)
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Forwarded to Governor on March 27, 2018 at 6:09 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
- Forwarded to Governor on March 27, 2018 at 6:09 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
- Assigned Act No. 2018-560.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1169
- Third Reading Passed
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Jefferson County
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 882
- Third Reading Passed
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
March 27, 2018: Roll 1169
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 6
March 20, 2018: Roll 882
- Yeas: 19
- Present/NV: 83
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor