+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 3:09 p.m. on April 18, 2013.
- Assigned Act No. 2013-108.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 468
- Third Reading Passed
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Children, Youth Affairs, and Human Resources
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 104
- Third Reading Passed
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
+ − Vote
April 18, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 468
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor