+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 131
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 130
- Poole Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Votes (2)
March 2, 2017: Roll 130
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 11
March 2, 2017: Roll 131
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor