+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 63
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ethics and Campaign Finance
+ − Votes (3)
February 23, 2016: Roll 63
- Yeas: 82
- Present/NV: 23
April 11, 2013: Roll 383
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
February 26, 2013: Roll 95
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor