+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on June 4, 2015.
- Assigned Act No. 2015-416 on 06/09/2015.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1363
- Third Reading Passed
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 998
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 997
- Engrossed
- Baldwin County Legislation first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
June 3, 2015: Roll 1363
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 9
May 26, 2015: Roll 997
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 82
May 26, 2015: Roll 998
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 80
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor