+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Constitution, Ethics and Elections
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Ethics and Elections
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1174
- Third Reading Passed
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
+ − Vote
May 28, 2015: Roll 1174
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor