+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 909
- Third Reading Passed
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 390
- Third Reading Passed
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Votes (4)
May 3, 2016: Roll 909
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
March 23, 2016: Roll 390
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 9
March 10, 2016: Roll 276
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 74
May 14, 2003: Roll 720
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 37
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor