+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2013-265.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Second House Concurs in Veto Override
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Marsh to Read a Third Time, Gov's objections to the Contrary Not Withstanding adopted Roll Call 1146.
- House of Origin Non-Concurs in Executive Amendment
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time, Objection to the Contrary Notwithstanding adopted Roll Call 1223
- Carns motion to Nonconcur adopted Roll Call 1222
- Executive Amendment Offered
- Forwarded to Governor on May 9, 2013 at 8:17 p.m.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Marsh first Substitute Offered
- Motion to Miscellaneous adopted Roll Call 928
- Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 929
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 930
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Concurrence Requested
- Carns motion to Concur In and Adopt offered
- Hammon motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 1198
- Carns motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1199
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
- Signature Requested
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 849
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1026
- Shedd intended to vote "Yea"
- Motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 1025
- Third Reading Passed
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
May 20, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time, Objection to the Contrary Notwithstanding adopted Roll Call 1223
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 2
May 20, 2013: Carns motion to Nonconcur adopted Roll Call 1222
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 4
May 20, 2013: Marsh to Read a Third Time, Gov's objections to the Contrary Not Withstanding adopted Roll Call 1146.
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 15
May 9, 2013: Motion to Miscellaneous adopted Roll Call 928
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 12
May 9, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 930
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 12
May 9, 2013: Hammon motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 1198
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 39
May 9, 2013: Carns motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1199
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 41
May 9, 2013: Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 929
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 12
May 7, 2013: Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 849
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 10
April 30, 2013: Motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 1025
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 35
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor