+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
- Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Judiciary
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 938
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2013: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Yeas: 9
April 25, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 938
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 1