+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 1:36 p.m. on May 28, 2015.
- Assigned Act No. 2015-337.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1247
- Third Reading Passed
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 718
- Third Reading Passed
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
May 28, 2015: Roll 1247
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 8
May 14, 2015: Roll 718
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor