+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 4, 2020 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-335)
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Forwarded to Governor on May 23, 2019 at 12:41 p.m. on May 23, 2019.
- Assigned Act No. 2019-335.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1043
- Third Reading Passed
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 769
- Third Reading Passed
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2019: Roll 1043
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
May 16, 2019: Roll 769
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 94
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor