+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 3:15 p.m. on May 21, 2015.
- Assigned Act No. 2015-202.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1095
- Third Reading Passed
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 657
- Third Reading Passed
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Tuscaloosa County Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
May 21, 2015: Roll 1095
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 9
May 12, 2015: Roll 657
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 66
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor