+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
- Assigned Act No. 2014-285.
- Signature Requested
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1230
- Third Reading Passed
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 903
- Third Reading Passed
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Vote
April 3, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1230
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor