+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On August 11, 2015 in the House:
- Further Consideration
- Jackson motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Hall motion to Carry Over Until Specified Time adopted Roll Call 45
- Third Reading Carried Over to Time Certain
On August 7, 2015 in the House:
- Jackson motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
- Jackson motion to Previous Question lost Roll Call 37
- Third Reading Carried Over
On August 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
+ − Votes (2)
August 10, 2015: Roll 45
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 27
August 7, 2015: Roll 37
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 58
- Present/NV: 28
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor