+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1094
- Third Reading Passed
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism
+ − Vote
May 26, 2015: Roll 1094
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor