+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1307
- Third Reading Passed
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Jones intended to vote "Yea"
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 923
- Third Reading Passed
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
May 19, 2017: Roll 1307
- Yeas: 21
- Present/NV: 14
May 17, 2017: Roll 923
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 73
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor