+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Beasley motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 507
- Third Reading Passed
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
+ − Vote
April 5, 2016: Roll 507
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 23
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor