+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1284
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Carried Over
- Smitherman first Substitute Offered
- Smitherman motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 1280
- Smitherman second Substitute Offered
- Smitherman motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 1281
- Motion to Carry Over as Unfinished Business adopted Voice Vote
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism and Marketing
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 863
- Engrossed
- Knight dissent filed
- Hall dissent filed
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Placed on the Calendar
- Davis first Substitute Offered
- Ledbetter motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 861
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 862
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
+ − Votes (6)
May 19, 2017: Roll 1284
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 6
May 18, 2017: Roll 1280
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 7
May 18, 2017: Roll 1281
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 11
May 11, 2017: Roll 863
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 30
- Present/NV: 5
May 9, 2017: Roll 861
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 33
- Present/NV: 4
May 9, 2017: Roll 862
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 32
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor