+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2013-79 on 04/09/2013.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on April 4, 2013.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Smith Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Coleman Amendment Offered
- Beason motion to Table adopted Roll Call 273
- Smith Amendment Offered
- Smith motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 274
- Beason motion to Table adopted Roll Call 275
- Smith Amendment Offered
- Beason motion to Table adopted Roll Call 276
- Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 277
- Beason motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 278
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Concurrence Requested
- McClurkin motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 253
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 44
- Motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 43
- Rogers Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 42
- Hubbard (J) Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (10)
April 2, 2013: Beason motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 278
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 10
April 2, 2013: Beason motion to Table adopted Roll Call 273
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 7
April 2, 2013: Beason motion to Table adopted Roll Call 275
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 11
April 2, 2013: Beason motion to Table adopted Roll Call 276
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 11
April 2, 2013: McClurkin motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 253
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 1
April 2, 2013: Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 277
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 11
April 2, 2013: Smith motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 274
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 1
February 19, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 44
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 23
February 19, 2013: Motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 42
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 64
February 19, 2013: Motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 43
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 66
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor