+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2014-244.
- Forwarded to Governor at 6:56 p.m. on March 19, 2014.
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 906
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 730
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Vote
March 19, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 906
- Yeas: 21
- Absent: 2